Chavez v. Stratosphere Gaming LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Chavez
Defendant: Stratosphere Gaming LLC, Stratosphere Gaming LLC doing business as Stratosphere Tower Casino & Hotel - Top of the World and Stratosphere Gaming LLC doing business as THE STRAT
Case Number: 2:2020cv01048
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation to Correct Caption, Accept Service by Correct Entity, Deadline to File Response to Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case caption will be corrected to reflect the Defendant's name in this case as: Stratosphere Gaming, LLC d/b/a THE STRAT. Stratosphere Gaming LLC answer due 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Correct Caption, Accept Service by Correct Entity, Deadline for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Stratosphere Gaming LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Chavez re #7 Summons Issued. Stratosphere Gaming LLC served on 6/19/2020. (Trenchak, Philip)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Stratosphere Gaming LLC re #1 Complaint. (EDS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elizabeth Chavez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Trenchak, Philip)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Elizabeth Chavez. (Trenchak, Philip)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2020. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than June 19, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
June 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6040650) by Elizabeth Chavez. Proof of service due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Trenchak, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Stratosphere Gaming LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Chavez
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratosphere Gaming LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratosphere Gaming LLC doing business as Stratosphere Tower Casino & Hotel - Top of the World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratosphere Gaming LLC doing business as THE STRAT
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?