Chowdhury v. PlayAGS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manjan Chowdhury
Defendant: David Lopez, Kimo Akiona and PlayAGS, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01209
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Kimo Akiona, David Lopez, PlayAGS, Inc.. (Lenhard, Kirk)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles H. Linehan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Prongay and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pavithra Rajesh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Muehlbauer, Andrew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Muehlbauer, Andrew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Muehlbauer, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2020 Re: #5 , #6 and #7 Motions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petitions. ERROR: The Notary Public's signature and seal is missing on page 4, lines 11-13 in each Verified Petition. CORRECTION:The Notary Public shall correctly sign her/his name and apply her/his Notary Seal. Attorney Andrew Muehlbauer is to file the corrected Motions /Verified Petitions using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event and link to document #5 , #6 , and #7 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manjan Chowdhury re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. PlayAGS, Inc. served on 7/2/2020. (Muehlbauer, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 View Corrected Image #10 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pavithra Rajesh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6076375) by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2020 (EDS).
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 View Corrected Image #12 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles H. Linehan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6076369) by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2020 (EDS).
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 View Corrected Image #11 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Prongay and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Andrew R. Muehlbauer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6076320) by Plaintiff Manjan Chowdhury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2020 (EDS).
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Robert V. Prongay, Charles H. Linehan, and Pavithra Rajesh to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/9/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Manjan Chowdhury. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Muehlbauer, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6058970) by Manjan Chowdhury. Proof of service due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for PlayAGS, Inc., #4 Summons for David Lopez, #5 Summons for Kimo Akiona) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chowdhury v. PlayAGS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manjan Chowdhury
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Andrew R. Muehlbauer
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Represented By: Charles H. Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lopez
Represented By: Kirk B. Lenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimo Akiona
Represented By: Kirk B. Lenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PlayAGS, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk B. Lenhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?