Chavez et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Chavez and Socorro Chavez
Defendant: Joseph Young, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation and Tom S. Palmer
Case Number: 2:2020cv01222
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #52 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 27, 2021 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order for Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting #49 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #45 Order (Third Request). Discovery due by 12/21/2021. Motions due by 1/20/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting #46 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Conner Spani for Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jorge L Alvarez. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2021 Filing 49 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re Discovery re #45 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
June 28, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #46 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Alvarez, Jorge)
June 25, 2021 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/25/2021 Re: #46 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 10-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case."Attorneys Jorge Alvarez nor Conner Spani CANNOT sign for their clients. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that on Page 5, Appointment of Designated Resident Nevada Counsel, Plaintiff's "Authorized Representative" is directed to sign his/her name on the signature line, and print his/her name and title below the signature line. ( /s/ or a typewritten name is NOT acceptable).Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link it to #46 . Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 23, 2021 Filing 46 VIEW #48 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Conner Spani and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jorge L. Alvarez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6533974) by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 9/22/2021. Motions due by 10/22/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 29, 2021 Filing 44 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and [Proposed] Order to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines and Amend Current Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
March 3, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/17/2021.(Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #20 Wyndham's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #26 Palmer's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #40 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/9/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 8, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Tom S. Palmer, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Motions due by 7/26/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 14, 2021 Filing 38 NON-OPPOSITION to #36 Unopposed Motion by Defendants Tom S. Palmer, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
December 31, 2020 Filing 37 ERRATA to #36 Unopposed Motion by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
December 31, 2020 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION Extend Discovery Deadlines re #30 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
December 22, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/22/2020. ORDER denying #34 Stipulation; The Court has reviewed the Stipulation and finds that it does not comply with LR 26-3. The parties are not permitted to informally stay discovery. They must seek Court approval by filing a motion or stipulation with appropriate points and authorities to the extent a stay of discovery is requested. The Court will not grant a discovery extension of 150 days, which is almost an entire second discovery period, because the parties essentially represent that they will not diligently conduct discovery while they await a ruling on a pending motion. Therefore, the Court hereby denies the parties' Stipulation (ECF No. 34) without prejudice(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
December 14, 2020 Filing 34 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery and [Proposed] Order to Amend re #30 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Tom S. Palmer. (Alarie, Michelle)
September 23, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Alvarez, Jorge)
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #27 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/26/2021. Motions due by 4/26/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #27 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Alvarez, Jorge)
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #27 . ERROR: Document is not in compliance with LR IA 6-2, as it states in part that the signature block must not begin on a separate page. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #27 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 VIEW #29 corrected image re Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
September 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) re #10 Amended Complaint by Defendant Tom S. Palmer. Responses due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alarie, Michelle) Modified event from misc motion to motion to dismiss on 9/9/2020 (DKJ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #20 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #10 First Amended Complaint (First Request). Tom S. Palmer answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to #10 First Amended Complaint, by Defendants Tom S. Palmer, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Alarie, Michelle) Modified on 8/24/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d)(SLD).
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. Replies due by 8/26/2020. (Alvarez, Jorge)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Socorro Chavez re #10 Amended Complaint. Tom S. Palmer served on 8/5/2020. (Alvarez, Jorge)
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alarie, Michelle)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion; ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Tom S. Palmer. (JM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued on Tom S. Palmer by Plaintiff Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal Pursuant to ECF No. 2 by Defendant Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Alarie, Michelle)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER as moot #4 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/28/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident Plaintiffs Socorro Chavez and Juan Chavez by Juan Chavez, Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 Motion, by Plaintiff Socorro Chavez. Replies due by 7/27/2020. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Specific Defendants ONLY by Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Socorro Chavez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Tom S. Palmer by Socorro Chavez. Adds and removes parties. (Alvarez, Jorge)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation; Re: #6 Motion, #5 Motion. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., Joseph Young. (Alarie, Michelle)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion, by Plaintiff Socorro Chavez. (Alvarez, Jorge)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alarie, Michelle)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Joseph Young. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Alarie, Michelle)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs by Defendants Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., Joseph Young. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Alarie, Michelle)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., Joseph Young that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc. added. (Alarie, Michelle)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/29/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/14/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815334-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6062847) by Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Joseph Young, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 29, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Young
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom S. Palmer
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Chavez
Represented By: Jorge L Alvarez
Represented By: Mark Albright
Represented By: Conner Spani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Chavez
Represented By: Jorge L Alvarez
Represented By: Mark Albright
Represented By: Conner Spani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?