Kozlowski v. Credit Management, LP et al
Plaintiff: Katie M. Kozlowski
Defendant: Credit Management, LP and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01296
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice James Acosta and approving Designation of Local Counsel Trevor Waite. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/20/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James Acosta and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Trevor Waite by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (JQC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Defendant, Credit Management LP by Katie M. Kozlowski. (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James Acosta to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/18/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katie M. Kozlowski. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020. (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Chris Meier to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/17/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katie M. Kozlowski. Credit Management, LP waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020. (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Katie M. Kozlowski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fox, Erik-Anthony)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6081176) by Katie M. Kozlowski. Proof of service due by 10/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlowski v. Credit Management, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Management, LP
Represented By: Chris Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: James Acosta
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie M. Kozlowski
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?