McGee v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dennis Lyon McGee
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01303
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Lyon McGee re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued as to USA. Andrew Saul served on 7/31/2020. (Osterhout, Lindsay)
August 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lindsay F. Osterhout for Dennis Lyon McGee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Fulton Osterhout and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6086547) by Plaintiff Dennis Lyon McGee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MR)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dennis Lyon McGee. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6083987) by Dennis Lyon McGee. Proof of service due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons USAO, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons OGC) (Taylor, Hal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lyon McGee
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Lindsay F. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?