Spencer et al v. Social Security Administation
Plaintiff: Whitney B Spencer and Diana Cole
Defendant: Social Security Administation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01304
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Social Security Administation, and U.S. Attorney General re #8 Complaint. (DRS)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administation by Whitney B Spencer. Plaintiff Diana Cole Dismissed by #7 Order. (DRS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #5 Whitney B Spencer's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff Diana Cole wishes to proceed as a named plaintiff in this matter, she must either pay the full $400 fee or file a new and complete application to proceed in forma pauperis that includes the financial information for Cole on or before 10/9/2020. The Clerk shall file the Complaint located at [1-1] and shall serve the Social Security Administration as outlined in the Order. The Complaint with respect to plaintiff Diana Cole is DISMISSED with leave to AMEND. Amended Complaint due on or before 10/9/2020 as instructed in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Whitney B Spencer, Diana Cole re #1 Receipt of Initiating Documents. (Attachments: #1 Cover email) (DRS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Whitney B Spencer. (DRS)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to file a proper Application to Proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) or pay the $400 filing fee in full on or before 8/17/2020. The Clerk is directed to provide the forms and instructions to Plaintiff (Attached herein). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge and consent form. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Form) (DRS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Whitney B Spencer. (DRS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons) (DRS)
July 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer et al v. Social Security Administation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney B Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?