Lis v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Lis
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01324
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Motions due by 3/30/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Discovery re: Scheduling Order, by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Robinson, Latisha) Modified on 8/31/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Robinson, Latisha)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/31/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Robinson, Latisha)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Telephonic 26(f) Conference by Jessica Lis. (Tingey, Bruce)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jessica Lis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tingey, Bruce)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Robinson, Latisha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robinson, Latisha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-20-816280-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6088028) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Robinson, Latisha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lis v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lis
Represented By: Bruce D. Tingey
Represented By: Justin Lee Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Latisha Robinson
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?