Choi v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Yuna Choi
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01329
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Motions due by 4/28/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/1/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Yuna Choi. (Markman, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT re Removed Action by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yuna Choi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Markman, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by David A Markman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuna Choi. (Markman, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/13/2020.(Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney Steven Keith Parke is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #8 . Attorney Steven Keith Parke is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Attempted, Not Known re #4 Minute Order Removal Case, addressed to Counsel Steven Keith Park. (DRS)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Extension to Answer or Otherwise Plead to #1 Petition for Removal. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 7/30/2020 (DRS).
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File a Response to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freeman, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-812941-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6088441) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Freeman, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choi v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuna Choi
Represented By: Steven Keith Parke
Represented By: David A Markman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Cheryl A. Grames
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Tara Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?