Kothari v. China XD Plastics Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: Jagdish Kothari
Defendant: Linyuan Zhai, Jie Han, Guanbao Huang, Huiyi Chen, China XD Plastics Company Limited and Taylor Zhang
Case Number: 2:2020cv01330
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Donald J. Enright for Jagdish Kothari and approving Designation of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Donald J. Enright and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John P. Aldrich (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6124632) by Plaintiff Jagdish Kothari. (Aldrich, John)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Extend Time re 3 Notice (First Request). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 3 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiff Jagdish Kothari. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aldrich, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jagdish Kothari re #4 Summons Issued. China XD Plastics Company Limited served on 7/21/2020. (Aldrich, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Donald J. Enright to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/31/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jagdish Kothari. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aldrich, John)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6088479) by Jagdish Kothari. Proof of service due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) (Aldrich, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kothari v. China XD Plastics Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linyuan Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guanbao Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China XD Plastics Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagdish Kothari
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?