McCoy v. Clark County
Plaintiff: Shantel McCoy
Defendant: Clark County
Case Number: 2:2020cv01331
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Clark County. (Freeman, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of NON-OPPOSITION to #5 Motion by Defendant Clark County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Freeman, Robert) Modified on 8/17/2020 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Clark County. (Teegarden, Tara)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Clark County. Responses due by 8/7/2020. (Teegarden, Tara)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Clark County. (Teegarden, Tara)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Teegarden, Tara)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-816053-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6088696) by Clark County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Teegarden, Tara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Tara Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantel McCoy
Represented By: Burke Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?