Reyes et al v. Tianchon
Plaintiff: WCCI LLC, Alfred Talahuron and Edward Reyes
Defendant: Malvin Tianchon
Case Number: 2:2020cv01348
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #8 Proposed Order Submission. Good cause appearing, the above- captioned matter, Case No. 2:20-cv-01348-GMN-NJK, is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Edward Reyes. (Kerr, Preston)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/4/2020. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Proposed Order, (ECF No. #6 ). On page 1, line 21 and page 2, line 2, Plaintiffs indicate dismissal is without prejudice. However, page 2, line 20 provides that dismissal is with prejudice. In order to clarify this discrepancy, Plaintiffs are directed to file a new proposed order clearly specifying whether Plaintiffs seek to dismiss this matter with or without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Edward Reyes. (Kerr, Preston)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiffs shall have until 8/5/2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Plaintiffs' brief must also address the Complaint's venue and personal jurisdiction allegations identified herein. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Malvin Tianchon. (HAM)
July 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Reyes Edward. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kerr, Preston)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Malvin Tianchon (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6091839) by Reyes Edward. Proof of service due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (Kerr, Preston) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. Tianchon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCCI LLC
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Talahuron
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Reyes
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvin Tianchon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?