Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5 et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A. and Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01375
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Wood, Brittany)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Stipulation to Stay Case. All pending #5 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #18 motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Dismissal of Case by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Wood, Brittany)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Combs, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Counter MOTION to Certify Questions to the Nevada Supreme Court re #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Combs, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. Replies due by 9/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Combs, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/27/2020. ORDER denying #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulated Discovery Plan and Proposed Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice due to its failure to correctly cite to and comply with the amended Local Rules. The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020. The parties are directed to review the amendments to the Local Rules, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, and re-file a compliant plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit an amended proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by September 3, 2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank N.A. added. (Combs, Jamie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. (Combs, Jamie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Wood, Brittany)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #11 : motion type changed by Court from "Motion for Miscellaneous Relief" to "Motion for Attorney Fees", pursuant to LR IC 2-2. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Combs, Jamie) Modified motion type on 8/21/2020 (MMM).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Combs, Jamie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 1 - Declaration of Brittany Wood in Support of Motion) (Maurice, Aaron)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Extend Time re #5 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Response to Motion to Dismiss re #5 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5, U.S. Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Combs, Jamie)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Maurice, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - HOA Lien, #3 Declaration 3 - Declaration of Aaron Maurice) (Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by First American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent First American Financial Corp. for First American Title Insurance Company added. (Maurice, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/8/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 24, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court State of Nevada, Case Number A-20-816376-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6097762) by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All Process and Pleadings Served upon FATIC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5 et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jamie K Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Fund IVC Trust 2016-RN5
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Jamie K Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?