Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Hospitality Network LLC
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Defendant: Hospitality Network LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01386
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
3 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting ECF No. #47 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 47 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC, Counter Defendant Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Wang, Benjamin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 45 Scheduling Conference,,,,, held on 11-10-20, before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 1/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 1/16/2021. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 3/16/2021. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Scheduling Conference re: #40 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order held on 11/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Kopp. Crtrm Administrator: A. Caytuero; Pla Counsel: James S. Tsuei, Esq., & Mark R. Borghese, Esq.; Def Counsel: Andrew Saul, Esq., Mitchell G. Stockwell, Esq., Michael Turton, Esq., P. Swenson Prior, Esq., & Vaibhav Kadaba, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 2:34 PM - 2:53 PM; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ FTR; Recording start and end times: 2:34:10 - 2:53:51; Courtroom: 3C; Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel are present via telephonic appearance. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears the representations of counsel as to #40 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's request at #40 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's request to stay discovery pending the resolution of the marking issue is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Joint Status Report must be filed seven (7) days after the marking issue is resolved, as stated on the record. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re ECF Nos. #42 , #43 Protective Order : Counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE AND E-DISCOVERY ORDER re ECF No. #42 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. (Turton, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - The Court hereby sets a telephonic hearing on the parties' Proposed Discovery Plan (ECF No. #40 ) for November 10, 2020 at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Counsel shall appear telephonically by calling the Court conference line at 877-402-9757 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 6791056. In order to ensure a clear recording of the hearing, the call must be made using a land line phone. Cell phone calls, as well as the use of a speaker phone, are prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 27, 2020 Filing 40 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC, Counter Defendant Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wang, Benjamin)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - The parties are hereby ordered to file a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan no later than October 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 14, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #37 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC.(Wang, Benjamin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/16/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC by Hospitality Network LLC. filed by Hospitality Network LLC.(Stockwell, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 21, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/21/2020. In light of Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF No. 34), Defendant's pending motion to dismiss (ECF No. 23) is moot. It is therefore ordered that Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 23) is denied as moot.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Houston, Thad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Mootness by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC re #23 Motion to Dismiss. (Wang, Benjamin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 34 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hospitality Network LLC by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Wang, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mitchell G. Stockwell for Hospitality Network, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew N. Saul for Hospitality Network, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Turton for Hospitality Network, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vaibhav P. Kadaba for Hospitality Network, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/16/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/17/2020 to correct hyperlink (DRM).
September 16, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Turton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6172795) by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. (Prior, Paul)
September 16, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Vaibhav P. Kadaba and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6172789) by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. (Prior, Paul)
September 16, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew N. Saul and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6172784) by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. (Prior, Paul)
September 16, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell G. Stockwell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6172771) by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. (Prior, Paul)
September 10, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hospitality Network LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cox Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Cox TMI, Inc. for Hospitality Network LLC added. (Prior, Paul)
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/2020. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendant has not done so. Accordingly, Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties no later than September 16, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Hospitality Network LLC. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (Prior, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney MARC A. FENSTER is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LE)
August 22, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC re #1 Complaint,,. Hospitality Network LLC served on 8/17/2020. (Borghese, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin T. Wang for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James S. Tsuei for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Larry Russ for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark A. Fenster for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Minna Y. Chan for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin T. Wang and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6126257) by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James S. Tsuei and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6126247) by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Larry C. Russ and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6126241) by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc A. Fenster and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6126238) by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Minna Y. Chan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6126177) by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Case reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01386-MMD-NJK. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Larry C. Russ; Marc A. Fenster; Benjamin T. Wang to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/10/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hospitality Network LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Borghese, Mark)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 VIEW #4 corrected image to NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:18-cv-00862, 2:18-cv-00864, 2:18-cv-00865, 2:18-cv-00867, 2:18-cv-00868 by Plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. (Borghese, Mark) Modified on 7/27/2020 (MMM).
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AuriQ Systems, Inc. for Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC added. (Borghese, Mark)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6099031) by Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Hospitality Network LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Mark Fenster
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Minna Y Chan
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: James S. Tsuei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Network LLC
Represented By: Michael Turton
Represented By: Paul Swenson Prior
Represented By: Mitchell G. Stockwell
Represented By: Vaibhav Kadaba
Represented By: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?