Gould v. United States
Plaintiff: Steven Eric Gould
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2020cv01474
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is Recommended that Plaintiff's case, located at [1-1], be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 9/16/2020 to correct Judge's signature date (SLD).
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/21/2020. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. 5 is DENIED under LR 7-2(d). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff would like the documents filed in this case filed in a different federal case, he must file a notice containing the criminal case number that these documents should have been filed in by 9/21/2020. If Plaintiff does this, the Court will order the Clerk of Court to file the documents filed in this case in the Plaintiff's criminal case and recommend that this case be dismissed. If Plaintiff does not provide this case number, he must file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee and file an appropriate complaint in this case, or the Court will recommend that this case be dismissed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Court to File in State Court case 91 A-LV-2165547 by Plaintiff Steven Eric Gould. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Order and Demand to Quash Process by Plaintiff Steven Eric Gould. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter) (DRS)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff shall either file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $400 in full on or before 9/10/2020. The Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff the proper application forms and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/10/2020. (Order, IFP Application and instructions mailed to P this date - DRS) Modified on 8/11/2020 to change Judge's signature date (SLD).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
August 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Eric Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?