Desio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rose Desio
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01486
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/2/2021. Motions due by 4/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rose Desio. (Sbaih, Jesse)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Teegarden, Tara)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/18/2020.(Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Rose Desio. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Sbaih, Jesse)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #6 . ERROR: Document reflects an incorrect party on the upper left hand corner under the attorney information. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #6 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 VIEW #8 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rose Desio. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sbaih, Jesse) Modified on 8/11/2020 (DKJ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/10/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/25/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freeman, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-815765-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6120149) by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Freeman, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Desio
Represented By: Jesse M. Sbaih
Represented By: Ines Olevic-Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Cheryl A. Grames
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Tara Teegarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?