Coca v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Peter Mark Coca
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2020cv01494
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number NVLAS072033 (DRS)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Payment of filing fees due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Brian Williams, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-1494-KJD-DJA. (DRS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Peter Mark Coca. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ 2254, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (DRS)
August 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coca v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Mark Coca
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?