Schuth v. Shelby American, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brianne Schuth
Defendant: Roe Entities A through Z, inclusive, Shelby American, Inc. and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2020cv01498
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Motions due by 3/17/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Brianne Schuth. (Padda, Paul)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM. Briefs due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/21/2020) (HAM).
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation by Plaintiff Brianne Schuth. (Padda, Paul) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (EDS).
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Shelby American, Inc.. (Wolff, Jordan)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM. The ENE will be conducted remotely via video conference, with an email containing a link to attend being provided to the parties the morning of the conference. The written evaluation statements must be submitted by email to Kimberly_LaPointe@nvd.uscourts.gov by noon on Wednesday, 10/14/2020. Do not deliver or mail them to the clerk's office. Do not serve a copy on opposing counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Shelby American, Inc.. (Wolff, Jordan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, (Answer to Complaint) filed by Shelby American, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/3/2020.(Wolff, Jordan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses herself as the settlement judge in this case. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of the settlement judge in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM)
August 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shelby American, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Carroll Shelby International for Shelby American, Inc. added. (Wolff, Jordan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-812965-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6124516) by Shelby American, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolff, Jordan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuth v. Shelby American, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Entities A through Z, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby American, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Danforth Wolff
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianne Schuth
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?