Perez v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Mario Lara Perez
Defendant: Richard E Butler and Western Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01502
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/9/2021. Motions due by 3/11/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/29/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Richard E Butler. (Surur, Ashlie)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Richard E Butler. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Richard E Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Surur, Ashlie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Richard E Butler. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mario Lara Perez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kenny, Bradley)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Mario Lara Perez. (Kenny, Bradley)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Richard E Butler. (Surur, Ashlie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Richard E Butler. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Surur, Ashlie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District, Clark County, Case Number A-20-810895-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6125964) by Richard E Butler. Proof of service due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13) (Surur, Ashlie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E Butler
Represented By: Ashlie L. Surur
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Lara Perez
Represented By: Bradley L Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?