Houston v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia Houston
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01505
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVED ACTION by Plaintiff Cynthia Houston. (Powell, Paul)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Stay Case, #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Stay Case, #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cynthia Houston. Replies due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Powell, Paul)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Hansard, Wade)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/14/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Casualty Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company added. (Hansard, Wade)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815977-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6128248) by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Declaration Of Wade M. Hansard, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Houston
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Represented By: Paul D Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?