Yoon et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Taekkeun Yoon and Su Jung Kim
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company doing business as The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01507
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Taekkeun Yoon. Replies due by 10/19/2020. (Valenzuela, Jose)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation; Re: #6 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/12/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Todd, Dylan)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Re: #6 Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Stipulation, by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Todd, Dylan)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/29/2020 Re: #9 Stipulation. ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IA 6-2 and LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney.CORRECTION: Attorney Dylan Todd is to properly format document #9 with the correct Article 3 Judge listed within the signature box pursuant to the local rules. File the corrected stipulation using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event and link to document #9 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 VIEW #11 corrected image to STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Todd, Dylan) Modified on 9/29/2020 (MMM).
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Todd, Dylan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Todd, Dylan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Travelers Indemnity Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Traveler Companies, Inc for The Travelers Indemnity Company added. (Todd, Dylan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Steve K. Parke is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Steve K. Parke is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-812218-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6129047) by Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Todd, Dylan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoon et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company doing business as The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taekkeun Yoon
Represented By: Jose E. Valenzuela, III
Represented By: Steven Keith Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Su Jung Kim
Represented By: Jose E. Valenzuela, III
Represented By: Steven Keith Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?