Cruz v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Blanca Miranda Cruz
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Isdel Suri Ruiz
Case Number: 2:2020cv01509
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/10/2021. Motions due by 7/10/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Clark, Troy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Isdel Suri Ruiz that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Vernice Charles, Other Affiliate Rommel Alcides Dolmusmunguia, Other Affiliate Marcos Alejandro Leon-Sanchez for Isdel Suri Ruiz added. (Hernandez, Cindie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,,, by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Clark, Troy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/2020. Defendant filed an answer prior to removal. Docket No. 1-7. The parties must file a discovery plan by October 1, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Clark, Troy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Jury Demand, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Blanca Miranda Cruz. (Young, Brittany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Blanca Miranda Cruz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Young, Brittany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Blanca Miranda Cruz. (Young, Brittany)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) Modified by Clerks Office on 8/19/2020 to add Vernice Charles, Rommel Alcides Dolmusmunguia, and Marcos Alejandro Leon-Sanchez as Interested Parties (EDS).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815766-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6129879) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's IAFD, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Nonservice, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit Defendant Allstate's Answer, #8 Exhibit Defendant Allstate's Demand for Jury Trial, #9 Exhibit Defendant Allstate's IAFD, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isdel Suri Ruiz
Represented By: Cindie D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Miranda Cruz
Represented By: Brittany A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?