Coleman et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: A. C. and Delilah Coleman
Defendant: Officer Ammon Peacock and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv01511
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Micheli, Jennifer)
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #25 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Delilah Coleman. Replies due by 10/12/2020. (Simon, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #14 the Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of an Infant Under the Age of 18 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner is appointed Guardian Ad Litem for A. C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 9/29/2020 (DKJ). (Main Document 24 replaced on 9/29/2020) (JQC).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation for Extension of TIme Re: #15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiffs Complaint re #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Delilah Coleman. (Simon, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiff Delilah Coleman. (Simon, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Answer to Petition for Removal, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Micheli, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Micheli, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #16 . ERROR: Certificate of Service is not signed. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #16 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 . ERROR: Certificate of Service is not signed. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #15 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 VIEW #20 corrected image re ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, to Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/29/2020.(Micheli, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 VIEW #19 corrected image re MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Micheli, Jennifer)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem Petition for appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of an Infant Under the Age of 18 by Plaintiff Delilah Coleman. (Simon, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #7 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR : Document #6 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Jennifer Micheli. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #6 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Micheli, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Delilah Coleman that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Simon, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR : Document #2 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Daniel Simon. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #2 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR : Document #1 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Jennifer Micheli. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #1 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Delilah Coleman that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Simon, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 VIEW #9 corrected image re PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-818546-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6129957) by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Ammon Peacock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Micheli, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 8/18/2020 (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ammon Peacock
Represented By: Jennifer Micheli
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Jennifer Micheli
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delilah Coleman
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?