Bank of America, N.A. v. North American Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company, North American Title Group, Inc. and North American Title Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01514
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #22 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/26/2021. Motions due by 5/26/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 1, 2020 Filing 22 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Bank Of America, N.A.. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Bank Of America, N.A.. Replies due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Brenner, Darren)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation of Dismissal of North American Title Company (NATC). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. North American Title Company answer due 9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE . Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 . Document title does not match the body of the pleading. Attorney Kevin S. Sinclair is advised to correct the document title to Joint Status Report in Removal, refile the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document, and link to #15 . (no image attached) (SLD) Modified on 9/16/2020 (SLD).
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against North American Title Company by Defendants North American Title Company, North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case, by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to #1 -2 Complaint, by Defendant North American Title Company. (Sinclair, Kevin) Modified on 9/16/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2020. (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Home Corporation, Other Affiliate Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Other Affiliate LFS Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney - Attorney Kevin Samuel Sinclair for North American Title Company substituted for Attorney Sophia Shunwan Lau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/1/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified text on 9/2/2020 (SLD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kevin S. Sinclair in for Attorney Scott E. Gizer and Sophia S. Lau by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Samuel Sinclair. and of Designation of Local Counsel per Local Rule IA 11-1(b) (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. North American Title Insurance Company served on 8/25/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. North American Title Group, Inc. served on 8/25/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. North American Title Company served on 8/25/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank Of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corp., Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corp. for Bank Of America, N.A. added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada's Eighth District Court, Case Number A-20-819616-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6130245) by North American Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. North American Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Company
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?