Farfan et al v. STATION CASINOS, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth V. Alva and Zezy R. Farfan
Defendant: NP Red Rock, LLC doing business as Red Rock Casino, Resort and Spa and Station Casinos, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01516
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Motions due by 3/24/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/24/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Elizabeth V. Alva, Zezy R. Farfan. (Neal, Victoria)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set to commence at 10:00 a.m., 10/21/2020, in the chambers of the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge, Cam Ferenbach, located on the third floor of the Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 3005, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION re Discovery STIPULATION TO REQUEST SETTING OF EARLY MEDIATION WITH A NEUTRAL MAGISTRATE JUDGE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16-5 re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs Elizabeth V. Alva, Zezy R. Farfan. (Neal, Victoria)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Elizabeth V. Alva, Zezy R. Farfan. (Neal, Victoria)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants NP Red Rock, LLC, Station Casinos, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by NP Red Rock, LLC, Station Casinos, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/8/2020.(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elizabeth V. Alva, Zezy R. Farfan. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Neal, Victoria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NP Red Rock, LLC d/b/a Red Rock Casino, Resort and Spa, STATION CASINOS, LLC. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Station Holdco, LLC for STATION CASINOS, LLC. added. (Mahoney, Scott)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial Court, Case Number A-20-816627-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6130588) by STATION CASINOS, LLC., NP Red Rock, LLC d/b/a Red Rock Casino, Resort and Spa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farfan et al v. STATION CASINOS, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth V. Alva
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zezy R. Farfan
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Red Rock, LLC doing business as Red Rock Casino, Resort and Spa
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Station Casinos, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?