Atchley v. C of SS AMS
Plaintiff: Rogers Atzhley and Roger S. Atchley
Defendant: C of SS AMS
Case Number: 2:2020cv01517
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against C of SS AMS by Roger S. Atchley. (JM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Address pursuant to 19cv2182 - JM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roger S. Atchley. (JM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Payment of filing fees or IFP due 9/21/2020. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must provide the Court with his address under Local Rule IA 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP w/Instructions to P - JM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JM)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atchley v. C of SS AMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogers Atzhley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger S. Atchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C of SS AMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?