The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust et al v. Freyssinet, Inc et al
Plaintiff: The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, Ironworkers Workers' Compensation Trust, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust and California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund
Defendant: McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Freyssinet, Inc, Western Surety Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Federal Insurance Company, Merchants Bonding Company, Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium and M.A. Mortenson Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01519
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Party Merchants Bonding Company terminated pursuant to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (DRS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers' Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (James, Evan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, Ironworkers Workers' Compensation Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (James, Evan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Freyssinet, Inc, M.A. Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Merchants Bonding Company, Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Western Surety Company re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Freyssinet, Inc, M.A. Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Merchants Bonding Company, Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Western Surety Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6131112) by California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust, California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust, The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Ironworkers Workers' Compensation Trust, California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund, California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust, California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund, California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund. Proof of service due by 11/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (James, Evan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust et al v. Freyssinet, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trustees of the California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Field Ironworkers Labor Management Cooperative Trust
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Field Ironworkers Apprenticeship Training and Journeyman Retraining Fund
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworkers Workers' Compensation Trust
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Ironworkers Field Welfare Trust
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Field Ironworkers Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Field Ironworkers Administrative Trust
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California and Vicinity Field Ironworkers Annuity Fund
Represented By: Evan James
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freyssinet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Mortenson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?