Baker v. City of Las Vegas
Plaintiff: John Baker
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2020cv01530
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff John Baker. (Gabroy, Christian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 10/1/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: Christian Gabroy, Esq.; by Video Conference Alan J. Reinach, Esq.; Plaintiff John Baker; Def Counsel: Jeffrey L. Galliher, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM - 1:30 PM; (no image attached)The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel. A settlement agreement was reached. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before December 2, 2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey L Galliher on behalf of Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Galliher, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Motions due by 6/16/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant City of Las Vegas. (Eslinger, Jack)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff John Baker. (Gabroy, Christian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, Defendant City of Las Vegas' Answer to Complaint filed by City of Las Vegas. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/10/2020.(Eslinger, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered to chamber or (if statements and exhibits are 100 pages or less) emailed to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov, not later than 4:00 p.m., 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Baker. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/19/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
August 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-818663-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6133685) by City of Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Eslinger, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Baker
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Represented By: Jack O Eslinger
Represented By: Jeffrey L Galliher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?