Houston Jr v. Downey et al
Plaintiff: Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr
Defendant: Ellison, Offenders Management Division, Sgt Downey and Tony Podesta
Case Number: 2:2020cv01531
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Exhibits, by Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. Address updated to Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208 Indian Springs, NV 89070. (JQC)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic NOTICE from HDSP, re ECF No. #4 IFP Application, that Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. has transferred to SDCC. (KR)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis, is Denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 10/20/2020, Plaintiff will either pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee) or file with the Court: See Order for Details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff does not file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents or pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action on or before 10/20/2020, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice for Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court, under a new case number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner ifp/instructions sent to P - JQC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (JQC)
August 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Jr v. Downey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offenders Management Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Podesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?