Rinear v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tracy Lynn Rinear
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01557
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Social Security Administration re #7 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul by Tracy Lynn Rinear. Proof of service due by 1/3/2021. (JM)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/5/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MMM)
August 24, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MMM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tracy Lynn Rinear. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tracy Lynn Rinear. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex.A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 8/24/2020 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinear v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lynn Rinear
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?