Arunachalam v. CSAA Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Lakshmi Arunachalam
Defendant: CSAA Insurance Group
Case Number: 2:2020cv01558
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees due 10/30/2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (HAM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing re #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Object: CD, Volume(s): 1, Description: CD, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (JM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lakshmi Arunachalam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Motion for Leave for ECF Filing) (HAM)
August 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arunachalam v. CSAA Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakshmi Arunachalam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?