Boyd v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Joanna Boyd
Defendant: State of Nevada, Steven Wolfson, Aaron Ford and Eric Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv01575
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that #1 -1 Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice because the Complaint fails to state claims upon which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joanna Boyd. (MR)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying without prejudice #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IFP/Filing fee due 11/2/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Inmate IFP insructions/form to P - MR) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (SLD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01575-APG-EJY. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/1/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joanna Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
August 24, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?