Alvarez-Gilberg v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01583
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jason Maier terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filers' account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #13 . Attorneys William T. Sykes and Sean K. Claggett (name of law firm) is advised to review and update their user account information. (no image attached) (SLD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph N. Mott, Esq in for Attorney Jason R. Maier, Esq. by Plaintiff Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg. (Mott, Joseph)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT, by Plaintiff Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg. (Mott, Joseph)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg. Replies due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Mott, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Opposition Deadline Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) OPPOSITION DEADLINE re #7 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Sever/Bifurcate and to Stay Claims for Bad Faith, by Plaintiff Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg. (Mott, Joseph)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Sever/Bifurcate and to Stay Claims for Bad Faith, by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 9/16/2020. (Hansard, Wade) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (SLD).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/31/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO Advantage Insurance Company added. (Hansard, Wade)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Wade M. Hansard re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hansard, Wade)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark, County Nevada, Case Number A-20-818857-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6144475) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Gilberg v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Terrance Alvarez-Gilberg
Represented By: Jason Maier
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: William T Sykes
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?