Xing v. USA Good Travel and Tour Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr Ziheng Xing and Ziheng Xing
Defendant: Mr Kongming Yan, USA Good Travel and Tour Inc, Kongming Yan and USA Good Travel and Tour Inc doing business as Mei Tour and Travel
Case Number: 2:2020cv01593
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to c/o Yao (Kelvin) Wen Esq. on 10/20/2020 by Plaintiff Ziheng Xing. (Attachments: #1 Request - AND - Waiver of Service of Summons - USA Good Travel) (Frizell, Robert) Modified date Waiver sent on 10/22/2020 (SLD).
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA Good Travel and Tour Inc, Kongming Yan. (HAM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Defendants USA Good Travel and Tour Inc. d/b/a Mei Tour and Travel and Kongming Yan by Plaintiff Ziheng Xing. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Kongming Yan, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Frizell, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
September 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Ziheng Xing. Proof of service due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xing v. USA Good Travel and Tour Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Kongming Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Good Travel and Tour Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kongming Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Good Travel and Tour Inc doing business as Mei Tour and Travel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Ziheng Xing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziheng Xing
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?