Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01606
Filed: August 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT re Removed Case by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #13 Motion to Dismiss, #14 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/4/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #14 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #17 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Darren Brenner and Lindsay Robbins. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Ancona, Esq.) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/5/2020. (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #11 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(d). An index of exhibits was not provided. Attorney Scott Gizer is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Companys Opposition To Motion To Remand; Declaration Of Scott Gizer, #2 Exhibit A - 2018.07.30 Order Affirming In Part & Reversing & Remanding In Part, #3 Exhibit B - Bayview Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - PennyMac Corp. Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - DLJ v. OR Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Deutsche v. OR Complaint with Exhibits, #7 Exhibit F - Cert of Authority Fidelity, #8 Exhibit G - Resident Agency license, #9 Exhibit H - Fidelity printout, #10 Exhibit I - Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada printout) (Gizer, Scott)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. served on 9/8/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. served on 8/31/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company served on 8/31/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 added. (Brenner, Darren)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8. Responses due by 9/17/2020. (Brenner, Darren)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/31/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-820307-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6148266) by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8 v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Trust 2004-HE8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE8
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?