McCart-Pollak v. On Demand Direct Response LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shana Lee McCart-Pollak
Defendant: Brett Saevitzon, Jeffrey Miller, Craig Shandler, On Demand Direct Response LLC, On Demand Direct Response III LLC, Tony Abbatangelo and Mark Meyers
Case Number: 2:2020cv01624
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mark Meyers, Jeffrey Miller, On Demand Direct Response III LLC, On Demand Direct Response LLC, Brett Saevitzon, Craig Shandler re #6 Amended Complaint. (Issued and Disseminated by Intake) (DRS).
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark Meyers, Jeffrey Miller, On Demand Direct Response III LLC, On Demand Direct Response LLC, Brett Saevitzon, Craig Shandler by Shana Lee McCart-Pollak. Removed party - Tony Abbatangelo. (DRS)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to 4 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Shana Lee McCart-Pollak. (DRS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Shana Lee McCart-Pollak ("Plaintiff") show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Plaintiff must demonstrate that the Defendants are completely diverse from Plaintiff. Here, Plaintiff alleges that she is a citizen of Nevada. (Compl. 3:3-4, ECF No. #1 ). Plaintiff also alleges that Defendant Tony Abbatangelo is a citizen of Nevada. (Compl. 3:24-26). Plaintiff shall have until October 8, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tony Abbatangelo, Mark Meyers, Jeffrey Miller, On Demand Direct Response III LLC, On Demand Direct Response LLC, Brett Saevitzon, Craig Shandler re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
September 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCart-Pollak v. On Demand Direct Response LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Lee McCart-Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Saevitzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Shandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Demand Direct Response LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Demand Direct Response III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Abbatangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?