Baluma, S.A. v. Poff
Plaintiff: Baluma, S.A. doing business as Enjoy Punta del Este & Casino
Defendant: Brian Poff, II
Case Number: 2:2020cv01642
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/3/2021. Motions due by 4/2/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Baluma, S.A.. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Brian Poff, II. (Edwards, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Baluma, S.A.. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Baluma, S.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Enjoy Consultora S.A.,, Corporate Parent Enjoy Guarantee Trust, Corporate Parent Enjoy Gestion Limitada, Corporate Parent Enjoy S.A., Other Affiliate TMF Trust Company (Uruguay) S.A., Other Affiliate UMB Bank, N.A. for Baluma, S.A. added. (Miltenberger, Christopher)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Baluma, S.A.. Replies due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Draw Requests) (Miltenberger, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Brian Poff, II. (Edwards, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Brian Poff, II. Responses due by 9/28/2020. (Edwards, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/4/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/19/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Brian Poff, II. (Edwards, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brian Poff, II. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-20-816593-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6157401) by Brian Poff, II. (Edwards, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baluma, S.A. v. Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baluma, S.A. doing business as Enjoy Punta del Este & Casino
Represented By: Christian Thomas Spaulding
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Poff, II
Represented By: Nicholas Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?