Las Vegas Casino Corporation v. Newrez LLC
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Casino Corporation
Defendant: Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2020cv01658
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Las Vegas Casino Corporation. (Yergensen, Christopher) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant Newrez LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Miller, Christina)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to #1 Complaint. Newrez LLC answer due 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Newrez LLC. (Miller, Christina) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (EDS).
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newrez LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Investment Corporation for Newrez LLC added. (Miller, Christina)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Miller on behalf of Defendant Newrez LLC. (Miller, Christina)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Las Vegas Casino Corporation. All Defendants. (Yergensen, Christopher)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Newrez LLC. (HAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING by Plaintiff Las Vegas Casino Corporation. (Yergensen, Christopher)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Filing fee $400) by Las Vegas Casino Corporation. Proof of service due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Blank Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Vegas Casino Corporation v. Newrez LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Casino Corporation
Represented By: Christopher V Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?