Acharya v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Dharmendra Acharya
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01685
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Carlson, Jonathan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dharmendra Acharya. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McTarian, Alexander)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by GEICO Casualty Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2020.(Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IA 11-1: The court has no record that Alexander McTarian has been admitted to the bar of this court. Attorney is advised to comply with the admission requirements of this Court. Admission form with instructions emailed to attorney. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/26/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Casualty Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO Casualty Company added. (Hansard, Wade)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Hansard, Wade)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Wade M. Hansard re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hansard, Wade)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark, County Nevada, Case Number A-20-818583-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6166357) by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acharya v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharmendra Acharya
Represented By: Alexander McTarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?