General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 v. MGM Resorts International, et al.,
Plaintiff: General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Defendant: New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC, Mandalay Bay, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC, CityCenter Holdings, LLC doing business as Aria Resort and Casino, Bellagio, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, Monte Carlo Casino & Resort and Park MGM
Case Number: 2:2020cv01719
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Based on the parties' #26 , #27 and #28 Stipulations to Stay, This matter is STAYED for all purposes to allow the parties to prepare settlement agreements and other documents necessary to bring this matter to a resolution. The parties must appear for a telephonic hearing to discuss the matter on 1/11/2021 at 1:30 pm. The pending #18 , #19 and #20 Motions to Dismiss are Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and Order to Stay Deadline by Defendants Bellagio, LLC, CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION re Discovery to Stay Deadline by Defendants Bellagio, LLC, CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulation and Order to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Bellagio, LLC, CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne) Modified event on 11/12/2020 (EDS).
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #20 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Bellagio, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC, New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC, Park MGM. (McChrystal, Lynne)
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC. (McChrystal, Lynne)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #18 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (McChrystal, Lynne)
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. Replies due by 11/4/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #18 , #19 , #20 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Bellagio, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC, New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC, Park MGM. Responses due by 10/29/2020. (McChrystal, Lynne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint, by Defendants CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2020. (McChrystal, Lynne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/29/2020. (McChrystal, Lynne) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. Mirage Resorts, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. CityCenter Holdings, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. Mandalay Bay, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. MGM Grand Hotel LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. Park MGM served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. Bellagio, LLC served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 re #7 Amended Complaint, #6 Summons Issued,. MGM Resorts International served on 9/24/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Edward M. Gleason, Jr. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit) (Ring, Nathan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bellagio, LLC, CityCenter Holdings, LLC, CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC, MGM Grand Hotel LLC, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Bay, LLC, Mirage Resorts, LLC, New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC, Park MGM re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01719-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (DRS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2020. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
September 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ring, Nathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Edward M. Gleason, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6173865) by Plaintiff General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. (Ring, Nathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6173811) by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. Proof of service due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons MGM Intl'., #3 Summons Bellagio, #4 Summons Mirage, #5 Summons NY-NY, #6 Summons Park MGM, #7 Summons MGM Grand, #8 Summons Mandalay Bay, #9 Summons CityCenter (Vdara), #10 Summons CityCenter (Aria)) (Ring, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 v. MGM Resorts International, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York - New York Hotel & Casino, LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Bay, LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Grand Hotel LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityCenter Vdara Condo Hotel Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirage Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityCenter Holdings, LLC doing business as Aria Resort and Casino
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellagio, LLC
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Carlo Casino & Resort
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park MGM
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?