Kalenowski v. City of Las Vegas et al
Plaintiff: MICAH KALENOWSKI and Micah D. Kalenowski
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo and City of Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2020cv01743
Filed: September 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Anderson, Lyssa)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Lyssa)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/28/2020.(Anderson, Lyssa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Micah D. Kalenowski. (Mcavoyamaya, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (EDS)
September 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of Las Vegas, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo (Filing fee $400 - NVLAS071926) by Micah D. Kalenowski. Proof of service due by 12/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EDS)
September 20, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400.00, receipt number NVLAS071926 (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalenowski v. City of Las Vegas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Kristopher John Kalkowski
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Kristopher John Kalkowski
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICAH KALENOWSKI
Represented By: Michael Julian Mcavoyamaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah D. Kalenowski
Represented By: Michael Julian Mcavoyamaya
Represented By: Timothy E. Revero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?