Mulcahy v. Kerns
Plaintiff: Tim Mulcahy
Defendant: Cedric Kerns
Case Number: 2:2020cv01788
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #8 and #9 Orders, addressed to Tim Mulcahy. (HAM)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff must file a notice with his current address with the Court by December 4, 2020. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation to the district judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Cease and Desist (ECF No. #2 ) be denied. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Immediate Relief (ECF No. #3 ) be denied. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Peremptory Writ of Prohibition (ECF No. #5 ) be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Extend Time to File Response (ECF No. #6 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must file a complaint by December 4, 2020. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation to the district judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) Modified on 11/4/2020 (HAM).
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time addressed to Tim Mulcahy. (HAM)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response (First Request) re #5 Motion by Plaintiff Tim Mulcahy. (HAM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Peremptory Writ of Prohibition in support of #2 Petition to Cease and Desist by Plaintiff Tim Mulcahy. Responses due by 10/27/2020. (HAM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in support of #2 Petition for Cease and Desist Order by Plaintiff Tim Mulcahy. (HAM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Immediate Relief by Plaintiff Tim Mulcahy. Responses due by 10/12/2020. (HAM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Cease and Desist Order by Plaintiff Tim Mulcahy. Responses due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (HAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #4 Declaration) (HAM).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400, receipt number NVLAS071992 (HAM)
September 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulcahy v. Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?