Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Douglas Furtado, Aurelia Skipwith and U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 2:2020cv01812
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy R. Atwood for Center for Biological Diversity and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Melton, Allison)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/27/2020 Re: #13 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #13 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner, Amy R. Atwood, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petition. Certificates of Good Standing must be attached to the Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 VIEW #15 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Amy R. Atwood and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6230545) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) Modified on 10/27/2020 (DKJ).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission for Allison Nicole Melton to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher Mixson. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Douglas Furtado, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Center for Biological Diversity. No changes to parties. (Mixson, Christopher)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony D. Ortiz on behalf of Defendants David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Ortiz, Anthony)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leilani E. Doktor on behalf of Defendants David Bernhardt, Douglas Furtado, U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (Doktor, Leilani)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/13/2020 Re: #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 10-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case."Attorney Amy R. Atwood CANNOT sign for her client and needs to specify that she is signing on behalf of the defendant. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that on Page 5, Appointment of Designated Resident Nevada Counsel, Plaintiff's "Authorized Representative" is directed to sign his/her name on the signature line, and print his/her name and title below the signature line. ( /s/ or a typewritten name is NOT acceptable).Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link it to #6 . Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Allison N. Melton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6201845) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Amy R. Atwood and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6199959) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 19-cv-01915 by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Springmeyer, Don)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Allison N. Melton to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/13/2020. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Center for Biological Diversity that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Paradigm Minerals USA Corporation, Other Affiliate Ioneer Ltd for Center for Biological Diversity added. (Springmeyer, Don)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Douglas Furtado, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6191231) by Center for Biological Diversity. Proof of service due by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bernhardt, #3 Summons BLM, #4 Summons Furtado, #5 Summons FWS, #6 Summons Skipwith, #7 Summons USAO Nevada) (Springmeyer, Don) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Leilani E. Doktor
Represented By: Anthony D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Anthony D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Furtado
Represented By: Leilani E. Doktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Anthony D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Leilani E. Doktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Allison Nicole Melton
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Christopher W. Mixson
Represented By: Amy Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?