Chapman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alicia Chapman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and United States Attorney District of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2020cv01858
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin S. Kerr for Alicia Chapman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Oregon Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supplement to #8) (Muckleroy, Martin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT by United States Attorney District of Nevada re #6 Amended Complaint, #9 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Attorney District of Nevada served on 10/15/2020. (HAM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re service of #6 Amended Complaint and #9 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel (#7018 3090 0001 1163 9313) and the Attorney General of the United States (#7018 3090 0001 1163 9306). (HAM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/14/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on the Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel (ECF No. 7) is DEFERRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Kevin S. Kerr, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on page 2, paragraph 3 of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 21 days from the entry of this Order to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (HAM)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ) shall proceed against Defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94105, and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Washington DC 20530.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the Summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) court days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper submitted for filing a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was mailed to Defendant. The Court may disregard any paper received by a district judge, magistrate judge, or the Clerk of the Court which fails to include a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - summons and amended complaint sent by certified mail to SSA and US AG; by email to USM - HAM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 View Corrected Image #15 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin S. Kerr and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Martin A. Muckleroy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6209346) by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Muckleroy, Martin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (EDS).
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Alicia Chapman. No changes to parties. (Muckleroy, Martin)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must file her amended complaint correcting the deficiencies noted above within thirty (30) court days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that if she files an amended complaint, her Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) no longer serves any function in this case. As such, the amended complaint must be complete in and of itself without reference to prior pleadings or other documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to MJ) (HAM)
October 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6200122) by Alicia Chapman. Proof of service due by 1/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Muckleroy, Martin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 10/6/2020 (HAM).
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Muckleroy, Martin) Modified on 10/6/2020 (HAM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney District of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Chapman
Represented By: Martin Muckleroy
Represented By: Kevin S. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?