Sanders et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Sanders, Marsallis Sanders and M. S.
Defendant: ZF TRW Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., Takata Corporation, Hyundai Motor Company and Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01861
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 33 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order STIPULATION re Discovery by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) Modified event from a stipulation to discover plan and scheduling order on 12/1/2020 (DKJ).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #31 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order of Dismissal for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey Warren for Hyundai Motor America and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mario D Valencia. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey C. Warren and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mario D. Valencia (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6246626) by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Valencia, Mario)
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 Joint STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #26 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/3/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thad K Jenks and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael E Stoberski. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/22/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice David R. Tippetts and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael E Stoberski. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/22/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Tippetts and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael E. Stoberski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6222612) by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Stoberski, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thad K. Jenks and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael E. Stoberski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6222587) by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Stoberski, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Cereghini, Paul)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Seby, Charles)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Responses due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Guy Simons, #3 Exhibit Mills Order, #4 Exhibit Godoy v BMW of N. Am. LLC, #5 Exhibit Complaint) (Stoberski, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR: Document #15 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Michael Stoberski.CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1.Document #15 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Responses due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Guy Simons, #3 Exhibit Mills Order, #4 Exhibit Goday v BMW of N. Am. LLC, #5 Exhibit Complaint) (Stoberski, Michael)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Hyundai Motor America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/26/2020.(Cereghini, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent ZF North America, Inc. for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. added. (Stoberski, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #10 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Michael E. Stoberski advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David R. Tippetts and Thad K. Jenks to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/21/2020. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Corporate Parent ZF North America, Inc. added (Stoberski, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add corporate parent (DKJ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cereghini, Paul)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, : Notice entered in error by clerks office. Document terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Entered in error by clerk. Document terminated. NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Paul G. Cereghini to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. (no image attached) (JQC) Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR: Document #1 and #2 were not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Paul Cereghini. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #1 and #2 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 VIEW #9 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hyundai Motor America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cereghini, Paul) Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 VIEW #8 corrected image re PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815255-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6200240) by Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Represented By: Thad K. Jenks
Represented By: David R. Tippetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Paul G. Cereghini
Represented By: Charles M. Seby
Represented By: Mario D Valencia
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sanders
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Eric Pepperman
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Joshua D Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsallis Sanders
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Eric Pepperman
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Joshua D Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S.
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Eric Pepperman
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Joshua D Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?