Odor et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Odor and Kevin Odor
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Does 1-10, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC, Roe Entities 11-20, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. and Ethicon, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01862
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/14/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 70 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #65 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Sanders, LeAnn)
October 13, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LeAnn Sanders on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Sanders, LeAnn)
October 6, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/6/2020. This action was received on* 10/6/2020* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Southern District of West Virginia* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01862-KJD-DJA. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 10/20/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 67 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-23786. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2020 Filing 66 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy transferring the civil actions on Exhibit A; the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the civil actions have been completed and remand to the transferor courts, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate; these actions are remanded to the transferor courts. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/6/2020. (cc: attys) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 65 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Virginia Odor, Kevin Odor to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 10/1/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and the Rules for Multidistrict Litigation, the court suggests that the cases on Exhibit A be remanded to the courts from which they came, as identified on the attached Exhibit A; on or before 10/2/2020 the parties are directed to confer and to file in this case, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the court directs that upon receipt and filing of an order to remand from the Clerk of the JPMDL, the Clerk shall remand the case to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is directed to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract the cases on Exhibit A and remand them to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; after remand of the cases, the Clerk is directed to formally close the cases and strike them from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/25/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; cases on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying as moot #58 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/16/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER (Dismissing Ethicon Defendants With Prejudice) granting the #61 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice due to claims being compromised and settled. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/9/2020. (cc: counsel; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor in opposition to #58 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Re Learned Intermediary, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order on Learned Intermediary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order re MPSJ, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email Chain, #5 Exhibit 5 - FDA, #6 Exhibit 6 - Medical Records & Bills, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Virgina Odor, #8 Exhibit 8 - Depo Transcript of Virginia Odor, #9 Exhibit 9 - Blaivas Wave 4 Prolift Report, #10 Exhibit 10 - DFS Tab 2, #11 Exhibit 11 - Depo Transcript of Dr. Hsieh, #12 Exhibit 12 - DFS Tab 3, #13 Exhibit 13 - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #14 Exhibit 14 - Deposition Transcript of Hinoul, #15 Exhibit 15 - Minutes, #16 Exhibit 16 - Patient Brochure of Prolift, #17 Certificate of Service)(Entsminger, Erica) (Modified on 11/3/2018 to remove reference to #59 memorandum in support)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #58 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kristen Marie Odor Yaeger, Marcus Clayton Odor, Kelly Jane Odor, Kevin Carroll Odor on dates and at times to be determined. (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2326 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN CERTAIN PARTIES by Boston Scientific Corporation, Virginia Odor, Kevin Odor. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 9/21/2018 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virginia Odor for Supplemental Report of Case Specific Expert Vladimir Iakovlev, MD, FRCPC, FCAP and Supplemental Report of Case Specific Expert Ja-Hong Kim, MD. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virginia Odor for Responses To Ethicon's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admission And Requests For Production. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 49 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Geoffrey G. Hsieh, M.D. on August 29, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. PDT (Attachment: #1 PTO #38)(Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virginia Odor for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virginia Odor for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Virginia Odor on June 5, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. PDT (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Virginia Odor on June 5, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 44 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Virginia Odor on June 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. PDT (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Virginia Odor on June 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor for First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor for First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admission, and Production of Documents. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents. (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Virginia Odor on May 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Claire A. Noonan on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Noonan, Claire) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Edie M. Cagnolatti on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Cagnolatti, Edie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kelly Juneau Rookard on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kim E. Moore on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Moore, Kim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Camala E. Capodice on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Capodice, Camala) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
March 23, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #31 Notice of Attorney Appearance and Counsel Contact Information Form. ERROR: Image is a duplicate of the image attached to entry #32. CORRECTION: Duplicate image removed. (lca) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christopher D. Morris on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Morris, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 31 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 4/9/2018 to remove image as duplicate of the image attached to entry #32) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Geoffrey Hsieh on 3/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor. (Entsminger, Erica) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
February 10, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Christy D. Jones advising of the assigned local counsel's new contact information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting MOTION filed in MDL 2326 by Artemus W. Ham and Erica D. Entsminger for Change of Attorney Information. The Clerk is instructed to update the information, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which said attorneys are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/22/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting MOTION by Artemus W. Ham and Erica D. Entsminger for Change of Attorney Information in MDL 2326. The Clerk is instructed to update the attorney information and firm name, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which said attorney is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/26/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
March 19, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
January 8, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Artemus W. Ham, IV (Ham, Artemus) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
November 14, 2013 Filing 19 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor against Boston Scientific Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC. (Ham, Artemus) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
October 9, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 30, 2013 Filing 17 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 55 (ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS TO AMEND THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE) entered on 09/20/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Nevada; Case Number 2:13-cv-01640. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-87) transferring case to the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by MDL on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 14 NON-CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-87) transferring case to the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by MDL on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY MINUTE ORDER re Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-87). Signed by MDL on 9/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 26, 2013 Filing 12 NON-OPPOSITION to #2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2326 and Memorandum of Law in Support ; filed by Plaintiffs Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor. (Ham, Artemus) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Jamison, Joni) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Russell, Howard) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Kevin Odor, Virginia Odor. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Ham, Artemus) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 13, 2013 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 9/13/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2326 and Memorandum of Law in Support.Plaintiff's responsive pleading is due on or before September 26, 2013. Defendant's reply is due on or before October 3, 2013. Motion Hearing set for Monday, October 7, 2013, at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #4 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings (First Request). The time for Defendants to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is STAYED until 20 days after the case is transferred to MDL No. 2326 or Defendant's Motion to Stay is ruled on by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 9/9/2013. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/27/2013. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Russell, Howard) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Healthcare Systems, Inc., and Ethicon's Consent to Removal by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. re #1 Petition for Removal,. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2326 and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Motion ripe 9/9/2013. (Russell, Howard) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-13-685020-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-2954859), filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Proof of service due by 11/8/2013. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/19/2013. (Russell, Howard) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2013 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 9/26/2013.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odor et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Kristen L. Henrichs
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Edie M. Cagnolatti
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Alyson B. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Camala E. Capodice
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: William M. Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Entities 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Edie M. Cagnolatti
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Alyson B. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Camala E. Capodice
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Odor
Represented By: Artemus W. Ham, IV
Represented By: Erica D. Entsminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Odor
Represented By: Artemus W. Ham, IV
Represented By: Erica D. Entsminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?