Allegiant Air, LLC v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al
Plaintiff: Allegiant Air, LLC
Defendant: Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118 and International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Case Number: 2:2020cv01866
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #10 . Attorney Aaron S. Markel is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Aaron S. Markel and approving Designation of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Douglas W. Hall and approving Designation of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aaron S. Markel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6277782) by Plaintiff Allegiant Air, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas W. Hall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Deverie J. Christensen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6277765) by Plaintiff Allegiant Air, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allegiant Air, LLC. Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118 waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/6/2020. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allegiant Air, LLC. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/6/2020. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division. (JQC)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allegiant Air, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Allegiant Travel Co., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate John Redmond, Other Affiliate Scott Sheldon, Other Affiliate Maurice J. Gallagher for Allegiant Air, LLC added. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6202744) by Allegiant Air, LLC. Proof of service due by 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Award, #3 Summons International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division, #4 Summons Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Christensen, Deverie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegiant Air, LLC v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 2118
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiant Air, LLC
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Aaron S Markel
Represented By: Douglas Ward Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?