Townsend v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tamara J. Townsend
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01984
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Thornburgh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bobby J. Bradford and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 11, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Thornburgh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6289119) by Plaintiff Tamara J. Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wetherall, Peter)
December 11, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bobby J. Bradford and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6289112) by Plaintiff Tamara J. Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wetherall, Peter)
December 9, 2020 Filing 87 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Graves, Sihomara)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 3, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6278311) by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Certificate of Good Standing for Anita Modak-Truran) (McCoy, Robert)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified Judge's signature on 12/2/2020 (SLD).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Robert McCoy and Sihomara L Graves added as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Inc. Attorneys Anita Modak-Truran; Susan M. Robinson; Kari L. Sutherland; Andrew David Tharp; David B. Thomas; William M. Gage and Christy D. Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/30/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 25, 2020 Filing 82 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Joint Status Report re #78 Minute Order, by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 11/25/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
November 24, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Substitute Attorneys Robert McCoy and Sihomara L. Graves in, by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (SLD).
November 3, 2020 Filing 80 ERROR: Document terminated - entered in error. No further action is required by Attorney Shimoara L. Graves. Attorney works with the same law firm located in Reno. CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #79 . Attorney Sihomara L. Graves is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD) Modified on 11/3/2020 (SLD).
November 2, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by attorneys Robert R. McCoy and Sihomara L. Graves on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert) Modified text on 11/3/2020 to add attorney Graves (SLD).
October 27, 2020 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/27/2020. This action was received on* 10/27/2020* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Southern District of West Virginia* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01984-APG-DJA. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 11/10/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 27, 2020 Filing 77 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-26725. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
October 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
October 23, 2020 Filing 76 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 2667-Order re Blaivas, #2 Exhibit ECF 6269-Order re Blaivas, #3 Exhibit ECF 2698-Order re Guelcher, #4 Exhibit ECF 6401-Order re Guelcher, #5 Exhibit ECF 2642-Order re Klinge, #6 Exhibit ECF 6398-Order re Klinge, #7 Exhibit ECF 3544-Order re Michaels, #8 Exhibit ECF 6296-Order re Michaels, #9 Exhibit ECF 2668-Order re Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit ECF 6519-Order re Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit ECF 2701-Order re Flynn, #12 Exhibit ECF 4153-Order re Flynn, #13 Exhibit ECF 2643-Order re Longacre, #14 Exhibit ECF 2724-Order re MacLean, #15 Exhibit ECF 4183-Order re MacLean, #16 Exhibit ECF 2649-Order re Ulatowski, #17 Exhibit ECF 4195-Order re Ulatowski, #18 Exhibit ECF 124-P MIL FDA - Lewis, #19 Exhibit ECF 157-D R2 P MIL FDA - Lewis, #20 Exhibit ECF 167-P Reply MIL FDA - Lewis, #21 Exhibit ECF 196-Order P MIL FDA - Lewis, #22 Exhibit ECF 202-P MIL FDA - Bellew, #23 Exhibit ECF 203-P MIL FDA Memo - Bellew, #24 Exhibit ECF 227-D R2 P MIL FDA - Bellew, #25 Exhibit ECF 287-Order P MIL FDA - Bellew)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 75 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8562) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8563) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8652) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8757) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8876) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Richard Wasserman)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 74 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8755) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8822) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 73 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8731) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8832) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 72 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8729) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8891) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 71 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8324) Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8325) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8401) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8721) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8908) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 70 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2130) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2131) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2269) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2280) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2854) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2855) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2913) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3048) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8714) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Flynn, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8874) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Brian Flynn)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 69 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8776) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8858) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 68 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 67 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8783) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8849) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 66 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8779) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8842) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 65 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 64 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8790) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8839) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 63 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2038) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2040) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2213) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3588) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3589) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3758) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3840) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8780) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8833) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 62 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #57 MEMORANDUM by Tamara J. Townsend in opposition to #53 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. ERROR: Incorrect image of Exhibit 4 attached. CORRECTION: Removed and replaced image. (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #56 Memorandum In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Chirag Vyas on January 9, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM by Tamara J. Townsend in opposition to #50 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM by Tamara J. Townsend in opposition to #53 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Aylstock, Bryan) (Modified on 11/21/2019 to remove and replace incorrect image of Exhibit 4) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM by Tamara J. Townsend in opposition to #48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Nathan C. Bess on behalf of Tamara J. Townsend. (Bess, Nathan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #53 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D.(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 52 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #46 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Teri A. Longacre, M.D. on November 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. PT (Gage, William). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #50 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Barry J. Koopmann on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Koopmann, Barry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Teri A. Longacre, M.D. on November 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Shonda Lawson on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of filing Amended Notice of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_PTO 214, #2 Exhibit B_Order in Carolyn Lewis v. Ethicon, Inc., et al)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 10/23/2019 at 11:00 a.m. by Tamara J. Townsend (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 41 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #38 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Richard Wasserman, M.D. on October 29, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. PT (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Oliver on 10/30/2019 at 1:00 pm PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Tamara J. Townsend by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PTO 214, #2 Exhibit B - Order)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Richard Wasserman, M.D. on October 29, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Paula Schwartz on October 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Oliver on 10/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by S. Mary Liu on behalf of Tamara J. Townsend. (Liu, S.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel J. Thornburgh on behalf of Tamara J. Townsend. (Thornburgh, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Bobby J. Bradford on behalf of Tamara J. Townsend. (Bradford, Bobby) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 10/23/2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Ja-Hong Kim on September 30, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Gregory Hsieh on October 23, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tamara Townsend on 10/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Schedule A)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Chirag Vyas on on a date to be determined at at a time to be determined (Attachments: #1 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Oliver on on a date to be determined at at a time to be determined (Attachments: #1 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tamara J. Townsend for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Paula Schwartz on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Shlomo Raz on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Ja-Hong Kim on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tamara J. Townsend of Dr. Gregory Hsieh on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tamara Townsend and Keith Burza on 8/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Subpoena, #3 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tamara J. Townsend for Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tamara Townsend and Keith Burza on July 10, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Subpoena, #3 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tamara Townsend and Keith Burza on 7/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Subpoena, #3 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew David Tharp on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Tharp, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5294 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/18/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 3, 2017 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Tamara J. Townsend. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 7, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 12, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 25, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 77 (AMENDED Order Scheduling Future Status Conferences & Other Matters) entered on 10/23/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 25, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2739004. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara J. Townsend
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: D. Renee Baggett
Represented By: Daniel J. Thornburgh
Represented By: DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS
Represented By: Bobby J. Bradford
Represented By: Nathan C. Bess
Represented By: S. Mary Liu
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Barry J. Koopmann
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Barry J. Koopmann
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?