Washington v. Quality Acceptance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Washington
Defendant: Quality Acceptance, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01986
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/24/2021. Motions due by 6/23/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Pamela Washington. (Hernandez, Kevin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/8/2021.(Sharples, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 17, 2020 Party Quality Acceptance, LLC terminated per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Pamela Washington. of Quality Acceptance, LLC (Hernandez, Kevin)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Washington. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/3/2020. (Hernandez, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Quality Acceptance, LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
October 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Washington. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6231948) by Pamela Washington. Proof of service due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Quality Acceptance, LLC, #3 Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Quality Acceptance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Washington
Represented By: Kevin L. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?