Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. v. Halloum, et al
Plaintiff: Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.
Defendant: Yousif Halloum, Iman Halloum and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02003
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to #16 Response to #15 Motion to Strike by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. (HAM)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to #18 Response to #17 Motion to Extend Time by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. (HAM)
December 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Defendant Yousif Halloum. (DRS)
December 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE re First Amended Counterclaim, by Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
December 18, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.. Replies due by 12/25/2020. (Williams, Donald)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Reply to #16 Response to #15 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. (HAM)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.. Replies due by 12/23/2020. (Williams, Donald)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE Magistrate Judge Rulings, by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. Responses due by 12/16/2020. (HAM) Modified event on 12/2/2020 (SLD).
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION of No Filing Fees by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. Responses due by 12/16/2020. (HAM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the case be DISMISSED without prejudice to Defendants seeking relief in state court. The undersigned further RECOMMENDS that Defendants' applications to proceed in forma pauperis at Docket Nos. #7 , #9 , and #11 be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Opposition to #8 Motion to Remand and to File First Amended Counter Claim by Defendants Iman Halloum, Yousif Halloum. (HAM) Modified on 11/23/2020 (HAM).
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Iman Halloum. (HAM)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by no later than December 2, 2020, Defendants shall either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file separate fully complete applications to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that this case be dismissed. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to send Defendant Iman Halloum the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as the document entitled "Information and Instructions" for filing an in forma pauperis application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc to Iman Halloum of IFP non-inmate form and instructions - HAM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Yousif Halloum. (HAM) Modified on 11/18/2020 (HAM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 by Plaintiff Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Williams, Donald)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Yousif Halloum. (HAM) Modified on 11/16/2020 to restrict access pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 (SLD). (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/17/2020) (SLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2020: #1 Bank Statements) (SLD).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Defendant Yousif Halloum. (HAM)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file fully complete applications to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office shall send Defendants the approved form applications to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as the document entitled "Information and Instructions" for filing an in forma pauperis application. Defendants must comply with this order no later than December 2, 2020. Failure to comply will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc to P order and ifp instructions and form - HAM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Defendant. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit) (JM)
October 30, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. v. Halloum, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yousif Halloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iman Halloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.
Represented By: Donald H. Williams
Represented By: Drew J. Starbuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?