Sicoli v. Walgreen Co. et al
Plaintiff: Annmarie Sicoli
Defendant: Walgreen Co. doing business as Walgreens
Case Number: 2:2020cv02020
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Motions due by 12/30/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Annmarie Sicoli. (Benson, Joshua)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Setting Telephonic Hearing on #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey.The parties are instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469 no later than five minutes before the scheduled hearing start time and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (DC)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Driscoll, Vicki)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Driscoll, Vicki)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Annmarie Sicoli. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Benson, Joshua)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Service Minutes of the Court re #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Driscoll, Vicki)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Driscoll, Vicki)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walgreen Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent WALGREEN, CO. for Walgreen Co. added. (Driscoll, Vicki)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-20-821298-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6238900) by Annmarie Sicoli Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Vicki) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 11/2/2020 to reflect correct filing party (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sicoli v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Sicoli
Represented By: Joshua L Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co. doing business as Walgreens
Represented By: George M. Ranalli
Represented By: Vicki L. Driscoll
Represented By: Jason Andrew Fowler
Represented By: James F Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?